This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/05/2021 at 15:09:25 (UTC).

BLOCK v. BRAMZON

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 BLOCK filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against BRAMZON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7431

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Dennis P. Block

Dennis P. Block & Associates

Paul Eric Gold

Defendants and Appellants

Brett Schulte

Daniel Bramzon

Basta, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Code Civ. Proc., 425.16(j)(1)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Appellant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Post

Attorney at BASTA, Inc.

1545 Wilshire Boulevard Sutie 600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Neda Roshanian

Attorney at Roshanian Law Firm

3150 Montrose Avenue

La Crescenta, CA 91214

Benjamin G. Ramm

Attorney at Law Offices of Benjamin G. Ramm

8605 Santa Monica Blvd., #93082

West Hollywood, CA 90069-4109

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: B292129 - 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Pub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & publication request(s) denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied. The request for an order directing publication of the opinion is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (petition for review pending); Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Dennis P. Block Attorney: Neda Roshanian Plaintiff and Respondent: Paul Eric Gold Attorney: Neda Roshanian Plaintiff and Respondent: Dennis P. Block & Associates Attorney: Neda Roshanian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including June 2, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: B292129 - One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Daniel Bramzon Attorney: Eric Post Defendant and Appellant: Basta, Inc. Attorney: Eric Post Defendant and Appellant: Brett Schulte Attorney: Benjamin G. Ramm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Petition for Review without bookmarks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B297198 B292129 (lead); Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: EC067254

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BASTA INC. & BASTA UNIVERSAL is a litigant

Latest cases where DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSHANIAN NEDA