This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/03/2022 at 19:01:35 (UTC).

Blalock et al. v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Blalock filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin, Lia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0991

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Martin, Lia

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jacob Blalock

Benjamin Novak

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Lia R. Martin

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Halt Gold Group, LLC (dba Patriot Gold Group LLC)

Mike Celano

Charley Chartoff

John "Jack" Hanney

Brothers Investment, LLC

Halt Gold Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Adam Phillip Zaffos

Attorney at Fernald Law Group, APC

15910 Ventura Blvd. Ste 1702

Encino, CA 91436

Clay R. Wilkinson

Attorney at Fernald Law Group APC

15910 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1702

Encino, CA 91436

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Tracey A. Kennedy

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1448

Brianna S Wilson

Attorney at Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP

333 South Hope St, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David Patrick Nemecek

Attorney at The Fortress Law Firm, Inc

50 California St Ste 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate filed on June 16, 2022, has been read and considered. It is denied not only because petitioners failed to provide an adequate record or a declaration stating why an adequate record could not be provided (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(D), (b)(2), (b)(3)), but also because petitioners substantively failed to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on June 16, 2022, has been read and considered. It is denied not only because petitioners failed to provide an adequate record or a declaration stating why an adequate record could not be provided (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(D), (b)(2), (b)(3)), but also because petitioners substantively failed to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of petition on LASC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 3 of 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 2 of 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROTHERS INVESTMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND MEMBER is a litigant

Latest cases where HALT GOLD GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA PATRIOT GOLD GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY TRACEY A.