This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/23/2022 at 03:14:14 (UTC).

Blaine Nickson v. Shemran, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Blaine Nickson filed an Other lawsuit against Shemran, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bermudez, Angel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8689

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bermudez, Angel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Blaine Nickson

Appellant and Defendant

Shemran, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Tara Zabehi

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice, PC

410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Travis Joseph Maher

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice, PC

410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Daniel Jonathan Kramer

410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Edwin Aiwazian

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice, PC

410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Dov Kantor

Attorney at Law Office of Eli M. Kantor

9595 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 405

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Eli Mayer Kantor

Attorney at Law Office of Eli M. Kantor

9595 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 405

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Transferred to Court of Appeal; Disposition Type: Final Division 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case transferred to San Diego per Supreme Court order.; Notes: Rec'd order dated Sep 8, 2022; CRC 10.1000(a)(1)(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Shemran, Inc. Attorney: Eli Mayer Kantor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: ARB; must be served on trial court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Shemran, Inc.Attorney: Eli Mayer Kantor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Blaine Nickson Attorney: Edwin Aiwazian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Blaine NicksonAttorney: Edwin Aiwazian

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: CCIS w/NOA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS-Incomplete, please attach the courts tentative ruling the minute order is not sufficient.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Emailed to counsel for parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Mar 14, 2022; Shemran, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: CVSW2107735; Trial Court Judge: Bermudez, Angel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEMRAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANTOR ELI M.