This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/30/2022 at 19:01:42 (UTC).

Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc. et al. v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Massullo, Anne-Christine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5598

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Massullo, Anne-Christine

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Blackhawk Manufacturing Group, Inc.

GS Performance, LLC

MDX Corporation

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

C. D. Michel

Attorney at MICHEL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

180 East Ocean Blvd., Suite 200

Long Beach, CA 90802

Sean Anthony Brady

Attorney at Michel & Associates P.C.

180 E Ocean Blvd Ste 200

Long Beach, CA 90802

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

John W. Keker

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Alexandra P. Grayner

Attorney at San Francisco District Attorneys Office

350 Rhode Island Street North Building, Suite 400N

San Francisco, CA 94103

Vesna Cuk

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Ave Ste 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7020

Esther Sanchez-Gomez

Attorney at Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence

268 Bush St. # 555

San Francisco, CA 94104

Brook Dooley

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Neha Sabharwal

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery St,

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Ariel A. Freilich

Attorney at Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence

268 Bush St # 555

San Francisco, CA 94104-3503

Travis S. Silva

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The request for stay and petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for stay and petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3 of 3 Exhibits 12-17 of 17 (pp. 0203-0325)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2 of 3 Exhibits 4-11 of 17 (pp. 0080-0202)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 3 Exhibits 1-3 of 17 (pp. 0001-0079)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief Immediate Stay Requested of Trial Court Proceedings or Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC21594577; Trial Court Judge: Massullo, Anne-Christine

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKHAWK MANUFACTURING GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant