This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/01/2021 at 23:56:53 (UTC).

Black-Garcia et al. v. Williamson et al.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Black-Garcia filed an Other lawsuit against Williamson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Juarez, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1306

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Juarez, Daniel

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Katherine Black Garcia

Henry Black

Christopher Black

Katherine Black-Garcia

Appellants and Defendants

Thomas D. Williamson

Sue Shreeve

Appellants, Defendants and Interested Parties

Thomas D. Williamson

Sue Shreeve

Michael Brunner

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

Katherine Black Garcia

Henry Black

Christopher Black

Michael Brunner

Katherine Black-Garcia

Respondents, Defendants and Interested Parties

Michael Brunner

Charles Brunner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

John R. Loftus

Attorney at Stroock, Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christine E Ellice

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park E Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Fred J. Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506

Andrew James Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group, LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506

Matthew James Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group, LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506-4253

Respondent, Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

S.V. Stuart Johnson

Attorney at Kesselman Brantly Stockinger LLP

1230 Rosecrans Ave Suite 400

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266-2527

Fred J. Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506

Andrew James Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group, LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506

Matthew James Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group, LLP

6780 Indiana Ave Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506-4253

Christopher D. Carico

Attorney at Carico Macdonald Kil & Benz LLP

841 Apollo St. Suite 450

El Segundo, CA 90245-4722

William G Benz

Attorney at Carico Macdonald Kil & Benz LLP

841 Apollo St Ste 450

El Segundo, CA 90245-4722

Respondent, Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorneys

John R. Loftus

Attorney at Stroock, Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christine E Ellice

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

2029 Century Park E Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

S.V. Stuart Johnson

Attorney at Kesselman Brantly Stockinger LLP

1230 Rosecrans Ave Suite 400

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266-2527

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final *B309287

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Documents refiled.; Notes: *B309287

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: The court has read and considered appellants' April 15, 2021 motion to consolidate B309287 and B311306. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that appellants' motion to consolidate is granted. Appeal B309287 (notice of appeal filed November 20, 2020) and appeal B311306 (notice of appeal filed February 3, 2021) are consolidated under appeal number B309287. All documents previously filed under B311306 are refiled under B309287. All future submissions to the court shall be made under appeal B309287. Appellant shall file a single opening brief 40 days from the date the record for B309287 is filed. All subsequent briefs shall be filed within the time provided by rule.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Thomas D. Williamson Attorney: Andrew James Knez Attorney: Fred J. Knez Attorney: Matthew James Knez Defendant and Appellant: Sue Shreeve Attorney: Andrew James Knez Attorney: Fred J. Knez Attorney: Matthew James Knez (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Thomas D. WilliamsonAttorney: Andrew James Knez Attorney: Fred J. Knez Attorney: Matthew James Knez Defendant and Appellant: Sue ShreeveAttorney: Andrew James Knez Attorney: Fred J. Knez Attorney: Matthew James Knez; Notes: (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (U)Civil filing fee paid by Knez Law Group.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 16, 2021 - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 2/3/2021 by Thomas D. Williamson and Sue Shreeve("U")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19TRCV00504; Trial Court Judge: Juarez, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENZ WILLIAM G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARICO CHRISTOPHER DANIEL