This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/19/2021 at 09:10:26 (UTC).

BJ's Restaurants, Inc. v. Ventura County Superior Court

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 BJ's Restaurants, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Ventura County Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Walsh, Henry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1613

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Walsh, Henry

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BJ's Restaurants, Inc.

Respondent

Ventura County Superior Court

Hon. Henry Walsh 800 South Victoria Ave. Dept. 42

Ventura, CA 93009

Interested Parties

Scott Foster

Nancilee Foster

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Sevan Gobel

Attorney at LAGASSE BRANCH BELL + KINKEAD LLP

626 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Alexandra Rachel Rambis

Attorney at LAGASSE BRANCH BELL + KINKEAD LLP

626 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2924

Interested Party Attorneys

Gerald Philip Peters

Attorney at Law Offices of Gerald P. Peters

P.O. Box 6759

Thousand Oaks, CA 91359-6759

Jilber S Jamgochyan

Attorney at Law Office of Jilber Jamgochyan

2835 Townsgate Road St. 102

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Andrew C. Bryman

Attorney at Bryman & Apelian

286632 Roadside Dr. Suite 200

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final GPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: GPTPetitioner's request for judicial notice, filed on April 12, 2021, is granted. (Evid. Code, 452, subd. (d), 459.) The petition for a writ of mandate or, alternatively, prohibition and request for an immediate stay are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petitioner's reply; 1 volume (206 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: by attorney S. Gobel for petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Opposition; VOL 1 of 1 (7)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Attorney G. Peters on behalf of RPIs N. and S. Foster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney G. Peters associates in for RPIs N. and S. Foster

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: EXHIBIT F-9 (thumb drive containing video)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: [SEE LETTER] . . .The informal opposition may be in letter format and shall be served and filed on or before May 10, 2021. Petitioner may serve and file an informal reply in letter format within 15 days of the filing of the informal opposition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: By petitioner (attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: NOTICE OF LODGING VIDEO IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE VOLUME 1 OF 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Stay requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2019-00525375-CU-PO-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Walsh, Henry

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/ is a litigant

Latest cases where BJ'S RESTAURANTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMBIS ALEXANDRA RACHEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOBEL SEVAN ESQ.