This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/24/2022 at 15:20:32 (UTC).

Bio Hazard, Inc. v. Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Bio Hazard, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Alameda. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brand, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3092

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brand, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bio Hazard, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Interested Party

Environmental Health Advocates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Peter Anh Tran

Attorney at Stern & Goldberg

6345 Balboa Blvd Ste 200

Encino, CA 91316

Alan N. Goldberg

Attorney at Stern & Golberg

6345 Balboa Blvd Ste 200

Encino, CA 91316-1517

Interested Party Attorneys

Craig McKenzie Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway 19Th Fl

San Diego, CA 92101

Jake William Schulte

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway Ste 1900

San Diego, CA 92101-5047

Noam Glick

Attorney at Glick Law Group

225 Broadway Ste 2100

San Diego, CA 92101-5014

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Petition for review & application for stay denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and request for stay are denied. (International Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1998) 62 Cal.App.4th 784, 788 ["We seldom use extraordinary writs to review interlocutory summary adjudication orders (grants or denials) and we see no reason why, absent other compelling facts, we ought to use the writ procedure to review orders that grant or deny reconsideration of a summary adjudication order based upon a 'change of law.' "]; see Farmers Ins. Exchange v. Superior Court (2013) 218 Cal.App.4th 96, 107 [noting "the general rule" that determination not to grant reconsideration "is not subject to review by means of a petition for writ of mandate."].) Moreover, the instant petition is substantially identical to a prior petition filed in this court (case No. A162359). The petition for writ of mandate is therefore also denied as repetitive. (Hagan v. Superior Court (1962) 57 Cal.2d 767.) Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and request for stay are denied. (International Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1998) 62 Cal.App.4th 784, 788 ["We seldom use extraordinary writs to review interlocutory summary adjudication orders (grants or denials) and we see no reason why, absent other compelling facts, we ought to use the writ procedure to review orders that grant or deny reconsideration of a summary adjudication order based upon a 'change of law.' "]; see Farmers Ins. Exchange v. Superior Court (2013) 218 Cal.App.4th 96, 107 [noting "the general rule" that determination not to grant reconsideration "is not subject to review by means of a petition for writ of mandate."].) Moreover, the instant petition is substantially identical to a prior petition filed in this court (case No. A162359). The petition for writ of mandate is therefore also denied as repetitive. (Hagan v. Superior Court (1962) 57 Cal.2d 767.) Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Sanchez, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2 of 2; Exhibits T - EE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 2; Exhibits A - S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandamus Immediate Stay of Trial Court Proceedings is Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: HG20072154; Trial Court Judge: Brand, Jeffrey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIO HAZARD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Alameda is a litigant

Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH ADVOCATES, INC., A CALIFORNIA ORGANIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHULTE, JAKE W