This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 14:47:31 (UTC).

Bhalla v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Bhalla filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lu, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3893

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lu, Elaine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dev Anand Bhalla

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Elaine Lu

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

City of Inglewood

Other

Southern California Edison Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dean E. Dennis

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill LLP

300 South Grand Avenue 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Kevin Herbert Brogan

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill

300 So. Grand Avenue One California Plaza - 37Th Flr.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

David William Skinner

Attorney at Meyers Nave

707 Wilshire Blvd., 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kenneth Ronald Campos

Attorney at City Of Inglewood

1 Manchester Blvd #860

Inglewood, CA 90301-1750

Royce Kerwin Jones

Attorney at Kane Ballmer & Berkman

515 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 780

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

Patricia A. Cirucci

Attorney at Southern California Edison Company

2244 Walnut Grove Avenue Ste. 331

Rosemead, CA 91770

Lisa A DeLorme

Attorney at Southern California Edison Company

2244 Walnut Grove Ave Law Dept Rm 341-G.O.1

Rosemead, CA 91770

Keith Edmund McCullough

Attorney at Alvaradosmith, APC

633 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Andrew Munro Jones

Attorney at AlvaradoSmith

633 W 5Th St Ste 900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3517

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review and application for stay are denied. [S270366]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: S270366 Petitioners' Reply to City of Inglewood's Informal Response to Petition for Review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: S270366 City of Inglewood's Informal Response to Petition for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: S270366 - IN THE SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA Attorneys for Petitioners DEV ANAND BHALLA and ROOPA BHALLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief, and the request for a stay filed on July 29, 2021. Petitioners have failed to demonstrate the superior court erred or that they are otherwise entitled to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition and stay request are denied. Grimes-Wiley-Ohta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 11 of 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate. ***STAY REQUESTED***

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF INGLEWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCULLOUGH KEITH E. ESQ.