This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/25/2023 at 08:02:12 (UTC).

B.H. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 B H filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7990

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

B. H.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

M. H.

H. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Whitney M. Kulp

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Christina Z. Beede

Natalie Danielle Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: No writ petition filed - juvenile dependency; Notes: Letter sent to counsel, petitioner and the trial court advising no petition having been filed, the case is closed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed scheduling order.; Notes: Petition due by 5/4/23. Preliminary response due 10 days (PS), or 15 days (MS/ES) thereafter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: 3 vols. CT (763 pgs.), 25 vols. Electronic RT (692 pgs.).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The Yolo County Superior Court. In reviewing the record on appeal, the court discovered that the trial court did not comply with this court's March 16, 2023, letter requesting correction to the record. At the direction of the court, the Reporter's Transcript is being returned once again as noncompliant. The record is to be corrected by properly binding the individual volumes of transcripts as required by California Rules of Court, rule 8.144 (b)(6) and (c)(3). The trial court clerk is directed to coordinate with counsel, and if counsel received non-compliant Reporter's Transcripts, to obtain their copy to be delivered to the court reporters for correction. The corrected record is to be recertified and transmitted back to this court and counsel by April 21, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Trial Court Clerk. At the direction of the court, I am returning unfiled the 692 loose pages of transcription for the Reporter's Transcript as noncompliant. The record is to be corrected by taking the loose pages of transcription and properly binding them into the correct volumes as required by California Rules of Court, rule 8.144 (b)(6) and (c)(3). The trial court clerk is directed to coordinate with counsel, and if counsel received loose pages of the transcript, to obtain their copy to be delivered to the court reporters for correction. The corrected record is to be recertified and transmitted back to this court and counsel by March 27, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Real Party in Interest Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency advising that Senior Deputy County Counsel Jennifer Cretcher-McCoy is now assigned to this case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Vanessa Murphy on behalf of CSR Gaynell James granted to 4/21/23. No Further Time Will Be Granted. ROBIE, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Vanessa Murphy on behalf of CSR Gaynell James requesting to 4/21/23. Completed 12 out of 12 hours.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 2/9/23. Record due 3/1/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20201372; Trial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20201371; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less