This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/11/2021 at 21:10:11 (UTC).

Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P. v. Superior Court Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 Beverly Hills Gateway, L P filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Raphael, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0749

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Raphael, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.

Respondent

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Tufeld Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Saul D. Brenner

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb, LLP

10100 Sana Monica Blvd. Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4164

Andrew S. Pauly

Attorney at Shoreline, A Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Avenue, Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1007

David Eric Hackett

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Daniel G. Murphy

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb

1000 Santa Monica Blvd. Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Damon Allen Thayer

Attorney at Shoreline, A Law Corporation

1299 Ocean Ave., Suite 400

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Michael J. Raphael

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 051

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Sean Gerald McKissick

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4632

James Lewis Goldman

Attorney at Miller Barondess LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate and the motion for judicial notice filed June 18, 2018, and the preliminary opposition filed June 28, 2018. The motion for judicial notice is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.252(a)(2)(B).) The petition is denied. Petitioner has an adequate remedy at law by way of appeal. (San Diego Gas & Electric Co. v. Superior Court (1996) 13 Cal.4th 893, 912-913.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real party in interest.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest's Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Manadte, Prohibition or Other Appropriate Relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion for Judicial Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Appendix of Exhibits + Exhibits Volume 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUFELD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Bennett