This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/11/2022 at 02:18:50 (UTC).

Bernal v. Valley-Todeco, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Bernal filed an Other lawsuit against Valley-Todeco, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alarcon, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6433

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alarcon, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Sandra Bernal

Defendants and Appellants

Valley-Todeco, Inc.

Arconic Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Ann A. Hull

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANN A. HULL

21900 Burbank Blvd. Fl 3

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Jibraun Bin Riaz

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 S Figueroa St Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

John P. Lecrone

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

865 South Figueroa Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: Pursuant to appellant's request to dismiss appeal filed on July 12, 2022, the appeal filed October 27, 2021, is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.244(c)(2)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's request for dismissal of appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Valley-Todeco, Inc. Attorney: Jibraun Bin Riaz Defendant and Appellant: Arconic Inc. Attorney: Jibraun Bin Riaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Valley-Todeco, Inc.Attorney: Jibraun Bin Riaz Defendant and Appellant: Arconic Inc.Attorney: Jibraun Bin Riaz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CIS submitted via TrueFiling on Dec 3, 2021 has been rejected. Judgment and/or appealable order was not provided as required by CRC, rule 8.100(g)(1).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Gonzalo Ponce.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Oct. 27, 2021: Valley-Todeco, Inc., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC721408; Trial Court Judge: Alarcon, Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLEY-TODECO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Arconic Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LECRONE JOHN P. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIAZ JIBRAUN