This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/24/2021 at 01:20:41 (UTC).

Berdan Holdings, LLC v. Absolute USA, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Berdan Holdings, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Absolute USA, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Recana, Mel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3475

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Recana, Mel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant

Berdan Holdings, LLC

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants, Appellants and Not Yet Classified

Berdan Holdings, LLC

MSNAR, LLC

Respondents, Appellants, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

MSNAR, LLC

Absolute USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Michael Alan Ambramson

Attorney at Michael Alan Abramson, Esq

8918 W Pico Blvd #120

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Michael Alan Ambramson

Attorney at Michael Alan Abramson, Esq

8918 W Pico Blvd #120

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Perry Roshan-Zamir

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2530 Wilshire Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Appellant, Respondent, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Perry Roshan-Zamir

Attorney at Attorney at Law

2530 Wilshire Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: [&] Pending assignment of the appeal to a division, the clerk's notice sent on July 26, 2021 is discharged. The final determination of the timeliness of the appeal is deferred to the panel in the division that will hear the appeal with the benefit of the full record. Nothing in this order stays any pending action in the matter. (See order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 24, 2021: 8.122 no RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply in support of brief in response to Court's July 25, 2021 letter re timeliness of appeal.(Sur-reply)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Respondents' Reply Brief on Appellant's Untimely Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Brief in response to the court of appeal's July 26, 2021 letter...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: A review of the civil case information statement filed on July 19, 2021 indicates that the appeal filed on June 10, 2021 may have been untimely filed. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104(a).) Appellant is requested to demonstrate in writing within 15 days of the date of this notice why the appeal should not be dismissed as having been untimely filed. Respondent may file a reply to the response within 10 days of the response file date. Any response shall have attached to it a proof of service. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2).) Appellant is advised that failure to comply with the requirements of this notice or to show good cause for non-compliance may result in the immediate dismissal of the appeal without further notice. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.104(b); Estate of Hanley (1943) 23 Cal.2d 120, 122-123.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Berdan Holdings, LLC Attorney: Michael Alan Ambramson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Appellant: Berdan Holdings, LLCAttorney: Michael Alan Ambramson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on July 12, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appeal filing fee: check# 48619 for $775.00 (ASAP Legal, LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/10/2021 by Berdan Holdings, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC635361; Trial Court Judge: Recana, Mel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERDEN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABSOLUTE USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY ROSHAN-ZAMIR