This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/18/2023 at 01:21:47 (UTC).

Benton et al. v. Tanintco Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Benton filed an Other lawsuit against Tanintco Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cunningham III, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8867

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cunningham III, David

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Lorenzo Benton

Curtis Walker

Telecom Network Specialist, Inc.

Appellant and Defendant

Telecom Network Specialist, Inc.

Respondent

Tanintco Inc.

Other

Bus. & Prof. Code, 17209 (Unfair Competition Act)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Reed W. L. Marcy

Jared Elmer Peterson

Randall B. Aiman-Smith

Hallie Linnay Von Rock

Ronald J. Holland

Pankit J Doshi

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Ronald J. Holland

Pankit J Doshi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: RB/XAOBNo further extensions are contemplated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 10/06/2023 By 21 Day(s) No further extensions are contemplated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 10/06/2023 By 21 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 09/15/2023 By 28 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 09/15/2023 By 28 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 08/18/2023 By 59 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: *** Motion/Request Deferred ***; Notes: The court has read and considered appellants' motion for judicial notice, filed May 19, 2023. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ruling on appellants' motion is deferred to the panel that will decide the case on the merits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits in Support of Appellants Lorenzo Benton and Curtis Walker's Request for Judicial Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: By Appellants Lorenzo Benton and Curtis Walker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stay order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellants' March 21, 2022 request for stay of appellate proceedings pending the superior court's issuance of a final order regarding attorney fees and costs. Good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all proceedings before this court as to this appeal only are stayed pending the superior court's issuance of a final order regarding attorney fees and costs or further order of this court. Appellants are directed to notify this court on or before June 24, 2022 of the status of the matter in the superior court. Failure to do so may result in the appeal being deemed abandoned and dismissed without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lorenzo Benton Attorney: Hallie Linnay Von Rock

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: Appellants' request for stay of appellate proceedings pending superior court's issuance of final order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Lorenzo BentonAttorney: Hallie Linnay Von Rock

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing fee of 775.00 paid for Benton, Lorenzo.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 7, 2022 by Lorenzo Benton et al.(U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC351252

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC354230; Trial Court Judge: Cunningham III, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC349267

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less