This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/11/2021 at 12:19:11 (UTC).

Benson-Hammer et al. v. San Luis Obispo Defenders et al.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Benson-Hammer filed an Other lawsuit against San Luis Obispo Defenders. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garrett, Ginger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8946

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Garrett, Ginger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Margo Benson-Hammer

Estate of Russell Hammer

Defendants and Respondents

Tim Olivas

Victor Perez, M.D.

Clinton Slaughter, M.D.

San Luis Obispo County Sheriff's Department

Geoffrey Kamen, M.D.

Dane K. Howalt, M.D.

Ian Parkinson

Penny Bornstein, M.D.

San Luis Obispo County

Barbara Defirmian, M.D.

Sam Slishman, M.D.

Patricia Ashbaugh

Christy Mulkerin, M.D.

Jeff Hamm

San Luis Obispo Defenders

San Luis Obispo County Public Health

Ronald Crawford

Bill Mulkerin, M.D.

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Paula Kay Canny

Attorney at Law Ofc Paula Canny

840 Hinckley Rd Ste 101

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jonathan Jeremy Belaga

33 New Montgomery Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard Stephen Salinas

Attorney at Salinas Law Group Inc.

8405 N Fresno St Ste 150

Fresno, CA 93720-1538

Winnie Yeung

33 New Montgomery Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94105

James Craig Schaeffer

Attorney at Boyce, Schaeffer Mainieri LLP

500 Esplanade Dr Suite 950

Oxnard, CA 93030

Brian Dale Peters

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Barry Zitron Brodsky

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final SLOSC filed 12-18-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: SLOSC filed 12-18-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.; Notes: dtd 12-11-20 from SLOSC; NOTICE OF ESTIMATE FOR PREPARATION OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL Due 12-21-20 to SLOSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: dtd 12-10-20; by atty B. Peter's for SLO Defenders et al.; Additional CT's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Margo Benson-Hammer Attorney: Paula Kay Canny Plaintiff and Appellant: Estate of Russell Hammer Attorney: Paula Kay Canny

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Margo Benson-HammerAttorney: Paula Kay Canny Plaintiff and Appellant: Estate of Russell HammerAttorney: Paula Kay Canny

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: CTs & RT's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 11-18-2020 by M. Benson-Hammer/Estate of R. Hammer challenging 10-1-2020 j/or

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 18CV-0681; Trial Court Judge: Garrett, Ginger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less