This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/20/2022 at 15:17:05 (UTC).

Benik et al. v. 13290 Contractors Lane, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Benik filed an Other lawsuit against 13290 Contractors Lane, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mosbarger, Tamara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5469

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mosbarger, Tamara

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Erik Benik et al.

Defendants and Respondents

13290 Contractors Lane, LLC, et al.

Kathryn Egan

Chico, CA 95973

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis A. Gonzalez, Jr.

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman Grodin Law Corporation

400 Capitol Mall, 11Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Brendan J. Begley

Attorney at Weintraub Tobin Chediak Coleman Grodin Law Corporation

400 Capitol Mall, 11Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

David R. Griffith

Attorney at Griffith & Horn, LLP

1530 Humboldt Road, Suite 3

Chico, CA 95928

Gregory M. Finch

Attorney at Signature Law Group

3400 Bradshaw Road, Suite A-4-A

Sacramento, CA 95827

Karen M. Goodman

3840 Watt Avenue, Building A

Sacramento, CA 95821-2640

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 05/11/2022. RT only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 05/06/2022. Appendix per rule 8.124 and RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mediation termination ordered.; Notes: Matter unresolved; HOCH, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Notification following an unresolved mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Counsel that Kathryn Egan has been removed as a party to the appeal and providing a copy of the court's docket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Respondent Kathryn Egan's former counsel, Karen Goodman, providing trial court minute order dismissing Ms. Egan from the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered to mediation.; Notes: HOCH, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Respondent Kathryn Egan advising she is not represented by counsel for this appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondents' mediation statements due: 02/07/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's paid. Receipt Number: R325280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Filing fee or fee waiver application due: 1/25/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellants file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellants' Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 1/25/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 1/4/22. (amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 12/23/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Butte County Superior Court - Main; County: Butte; Trial Court Case Number: 18CV03508; Trial Court Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 13290 Contractors Lane, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Finch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOODMAN KAREN M. ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Griffith, David Richard