This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/18/2021 at 15:25:17 (UTC).

Ben and Amy, LLC v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Ben and Amy, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosales, Olivia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1745

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosales, Olivia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ben and Amy, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

SS Custom Furniture, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Eric A. Kuzdenyi

Attorney at Lee & Oh, APLC

3580 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1050

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Olivia Rosales

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Bryan Mashian

Attorney at Mashian Law Group, APC

11777 San Vicente Boulevard Suite #640

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed April 20, 2021, the opposition filed April 28, 2021, and the reply filed May 6, 2021. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. LAVIN, J., Acting P. J. EGERTON, J. THOMAS, J.* _______________ *Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed April 20, 2021, the opposition filed April 28, 2021, and the reply filed May 6, 2021. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. LAVIN, J., Acting P. J. EGERTON, J. THOMAS, J.* _______________ *Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply to opposition to petition for writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: PRELIMINARY OPPOSITION OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE, PROHIBITION AND/OR OTHER APPROPRIATE RELIEF ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF AND REAL PARTY IN INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KUZDENYI ERIC A.