This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/26/2023 at 05:09:46 (UTC).

BELTRANCHUC (TARE) ON H.C

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 BELTRANCHUC TARE ON H C was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8364

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tare Beltranchuc

Respondent

California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Danielle Harris

Matthew Jeremy Sotorosen

Respondent Attorneys

Brian Campbell Kinney

Attorney General - San Francisco Office

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Evans, J., was recused and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: JUSTICE RECUSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Tare Beltranchuc Attorney: Danielle Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Non-Title Respondent: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation Attorney: Brian Campbell Kinney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition requested; Notes: Dear Counsel: The court has directed that I request an answer to the above referenced matter. The petition is enclosed as an email attachment. The answer is to be served upon petitioner and filed in this court on or before February 16, 2023. The answer must be electronically filed. Petitioner will then have ten (10) days in which to serve and file a reply to the answer. Your answer should address the following: Whether petitioner has established a prima facie case for relief, such that this court should grant the petition for review, and transfer the matter to the Court of Appeal with instructions to issue an order to show cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.500(b)(4), 8.528(d).) Please be advised that the instant petition is a petition for review, and a ruling by the court is due on or before March 28, 2023. This request for an answer should be expedited by your office, and no request for extension of time is contemplated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Tare Beltranchuc Attorney: Danielle Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: A166255; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 02311974; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 2311974

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less