This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/15/2023 at 08:01:56 (UTC).

Bellflower Unified School District v. Public Employment Relations Board

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 Bellflower Unified School District filed an Other lawsuit against Public Employment Relations Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9777

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bellflower Unified School District

Respondent

Public Employment Relations Board

Interested Party

California School Employees Association, Chapter 32

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Eric Bathen

Richard Dale Brady

Respondent Attorney

J. Felix De La Torre

Interested Party Attorneys

Alex Sasha Leenson

Andrew J. Kahn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Petitioners opening brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume XIII of XVIII (Pages 4794 - 4838 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume XVIII of XVIII (Pages 5192 - 5718 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume XVII of XVIII (Pages 5028 - 5191 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume XV of XVIII (Pages 4925 - 4991 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume IV of XVIII (Pages 1363 - 1860 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume V of XVIII (Pages 1861 - 2388 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume III of XVIII (Pages 1123 - 1362 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume II of XVIII (Pages 504 - 1122 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: 1. Declaration of Appeals Assistant Joseph Seisa to all parties 2. Table of Contents to all parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certified record from board filed.; Notes: ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Volume I of XVIII (Pages 1 - 503 of 5718)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of review filed (PERB).; Notes: Review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less