This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/13/2022 at 02:13:35 (UTC).

In re Alceone Bell - Conservatorship

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 In re Alceone Bell - Conservatorship was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bogdanoff, Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1461

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bogdanoff, Lee

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Latiff Diop

Respondent

Alceone Bell

Not Yet Classified

Bell, Alceone - Conservatorship

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorney

Kaveh Keshmiri

Attorney at Law Office of Kaveh Keshmiri

17322 Murphy Ave

Irvine, CA 92614

Respondent Attorneys

Jeffrey Paul Marvan

Attorney at The Law Office of Jeff Marvan

3055 Wilshire Blvd Ste 630

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Bruce Neal Ellman

1100 Glendon Ave., Fl 15

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

B311461

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The February 11, 2021 order is affirmed.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Perluss, Dennis M.; Participants: Segal, John (Concur) Feuer, Gail Ruderman (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The February 11, 2021 order is affirmed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: December 3, 2021 at 1:30 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice sent to parties re: case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Notes: Respondent: Alceone Bell Attorney: Bruce Neal Ellman Attorney: Jeffrey Paul Marvan *Brief was due October 14, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Feb 17, 2021 by Latif Diop ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Latiff DiopAttorney: Kaveh Keshmiri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The clerk received and filed on April 14, 2021 the Civil Case Information Statement. Part III of the civil case information statement indicates that Jeffrey Marvan is co-counsel for Alceone Bell. However, the available record reflects that Bruce N. Ellman is counsel of record for Alceone Bell. Please submit, within 10 days of the date of this notice, either a notice of association of counsel or other clarification as to Alceone Bell representation with a proof of service attached (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Latiff Diop Attorney: Kaveh Keshmiri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Latiff DiopAttorney: Kaveh Keshmiri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Feb 17, 2021 by Latif Diop

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 17STPB11004; Trial Court Judge: Bogdanoff, Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KESHMIRI, KAVEH