This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/21/2023 at 02:04:30 (UTC).

Bei v. Hyundai Motor America

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 Bei filed an Other lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wolk, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7798

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wolk, Daniel

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Tanner J. Bei

Respondent and Defendant

Hyundai Motor America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy-Lyn Morse

Attorney at Knight Law Group, LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6225

Radomir R. Kirnos

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2325

Cynthia E. Tobisman

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

6420 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Spencer P. Hugret

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

633 W 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eric Tsai

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-3367

John Barrow Sprangers

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 West Olive Avenue, 8Th Floor

Burbank, CA 91505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: RENNER, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: By appellant. Respondent's mediation statement due: 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant associating in attorney Cynthia E. Tobisman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Respondent aassociating in attorney John B. Spranger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after the appellant files.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: And Civil Appeal Mediation Statement Due: 02/15/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid. #R325911.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 01/19/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: CV20151427; Trial Court Judge: Wolk, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less