This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/13/2022 at 03:03:44 (UTC).

BEIERSCHMITT v. GROBET FILE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 BEIERSCHMITT filed an Other lawsuit against GROBET FILE COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4610

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Margaret Beierschmitt

Karl Beierschmitt

Respondent and Defendant

Grobet File Company of America, LLC

Not Yet Classified

Consumer Attorneys of California

Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Benno Ashrafi

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

1880 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Josiah William Parker

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg PC

1880 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tyler Robert Stock

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

1880 Century Park East, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1618

Sharon J. Arkin

Attorney at The Arkin Law Firm

1720 Winchuck River Road

Brookings, OR 97415

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Peter Keith Renstrom

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

611 Gateway Blvd. Ste 120

South San Francisco, CA 94080

Todd Marshall Thacker

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

611 Gateway Boulevard, Suite 120

South San Francisco, CA 94080-7066

Gabriel A. Jackson

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

611 Gateway Blvd Ste 120

South San Francisco, CA 94080

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Benjamin Israel Siminou

Attorney at Singleton Schreiber McKenzie & Scott, LLP

450 A Street, 5Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Christine Ann Renken

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC

100 North Pacific Coast Highway Suite 1350

El Segundo, CA 90245-5655

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed); Notes: The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion in the above-entitled appeal are denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC Attorney: Christine Ann Renken

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: Consumer Attorneys of California Attorney: Benjamin Israel Siminou

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Margaret Beierschmitt Attorney: Josiah William Parker Plaintiff and Appellant: Karl Beierschmitt Attorney: Josiah William Parker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B310754; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV07688; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP4674

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIMMONS HANLY CONROY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GROBET FILE COMPANY OF AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Consumer Attorneys of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Ann Renken