This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/06/2022 at 23:05:59 (UTC).

Beebe v. Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Beebe filed an Other lawsuit against Wonderful Pistachios Almonds LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3502

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lampe, David

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Dale Beebe

Insurance Company of the West

Respondents and Defendants

Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC

James Tjerrild

Poential Design, Inc.

Potential Design, Inc.

Intervenor and Plaintiff

Insurance Company of the West

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Alan Hacker

Attorney at Hacker Law Group

24307 Magic Mountain Parkway #246

Valencia, CA 91355

Peter Vincent FitzPatrick

Attorney at Bradford & Barthel, LLP

3270 Inland Empire Blvd Ste 200

Ontario, CA 91764-5580

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Matthew David Moran

Attorney at Roll Law Group P.C.

11444 W Olympic Blvd Suite 740

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Courtney Elena Vaudreuil

Attorney at Roll Law Group P.C.

11444 W Olympic Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1557

Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorney

Peter Vincent FitzPatrick

Attorney at Bradford & Barthel, LLP

3270 Inland Empire Blvd Ste 200

Ontario, CA 91764-5580

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $390 Responsive Filing fee paid via TrueFiling.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 09/02/2022 By 58 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Dale Beebe Attorney: Jeffrey Alan Hacker CIP included

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 09/02/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLCAttorney: Courtney Elena Vaudreuil Defendant and Respondent: James TjerrildAttorney: Courtney Elena Vaudreuil Defendant and Respondent: Potential Design, Inc.Attorney: Courtney Elena Vaudreuil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Dale BeebeAttorney: Jeffrey Alan Hacker; Notes: CIP included

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Opening brief submitted by Atty Hacker; The first page of the document (coversheet) should be page 1 and numbered consecutively throughout the entire document. Please check page numbers in table of contents so that they correspond to the correct document headings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: Exhibits A-9 (merged) submitted in Support of Motion by Atty Hacker obo Applt Beebe: 1) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 2) Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts; 3) Proposed Order; 4) Declaration of Conrad Dunlop; 5) Declaration of James Tjerrild; 6) Declaration of Ben Kollmeyer; 7) Declaration of Dr. Chad Hage; 8) Declaration of Dr. Chad Hage - Cont.; and 9) Declaration of Courtney E. Vaudreuil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: No opposition having been filed within the time permitted and good cause appearing, appellant's "MOTION TO AUGMENT...," (motion) filed on April 12, 2022, is granted. The Clerk/Executive Officer of this court is directed to file appellant's "Exhibits" received on April 12, 2022, which will be deemed part of the record on appeal. Appellant's opening brief remains due for filing on or before June 3, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Motion to Augment by Atty Hacker filed 4/12/22. (Exhibits received 4/12/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits A-9 (merged) submitted in Support of Motion by Atty Hacker obo Applt Beebe: 1) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; 2) Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts; 3) Proposed Order; 4) Declaration of Conrad Dunlop; 5) Declaration of James Tjerrild; 6) Declaration of Ben Kollmeyer; 7) Declaration of Dr. Chad Hage; 8) Declaration of Dr. Chad Hage - Cont.; and 9) Declaration of Courtney E. Vaudreuil -

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All Counsel and Superior Court Re: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Atty Vaudreuil obo Respondents Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Vaudreuil obo Respondents Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Hacker obo Applt Beebe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement by Atty Hacker; no copy of judgment/order being appealed from attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Hacker obo Applt Beebe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All counsel and superior court re: Mediation Screening Questionnaire due within 10 days; Civil Case Information Statement due within 15 days after the superior court clerk sends the notification of the filing of the notice of appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 obo Applt Dale Beebe (Check #9151)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Jeffrey Hacker obo Applt Dale Beebe appeal from judgment after an order granting a summary judgment motion entered on 8/29/2021; notice of entry of final judgment filed 9/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-17-102664; Trial Court Judge: Lampe, David

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Poential Design, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK PETER V.