This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/17/2023 at 02:05:04 (UTC).

Beckford v. Katerjian

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Beckford filed an Other lawsuit against Katerjian. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Martella, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4545

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Martella, Timothy

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Ashley Michelle Beckford

Appellant

Harout Katerjian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Canaan Joshua Knapp

Attorney at Fozi Dwork & Modafferi, LLP

5942 Priestly Dr Ste 100

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Daniel Stephen Modafferi

Attorney at Fozi Dwork & Modafferi LLP

5942 Priestly Dr., Ste 100

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Appellant Attorney

Alejandro Manuel Valenzuela

Attorney at Dordulian Law Group

550 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 1990

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: proof of service of NOA on Judicial Council per CCP 425.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 18, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: CCP 425.16 notice sent to appellant's counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Harout Katerjian Attorney: Alejandro Manuel Valenzuela

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for Harout Katerjian.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Harout KaterjianAttorney: Alejandro Manuel Valenzuela

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: no fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Nov 7, 2022 by Harout Katerjian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22PDRO01244; Trial Court Judge: Martella, Timothy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less