This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/07/2022 at 15:25:57 (UTC).

Becker v. Carrington Mortgage Services, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Becker filed an Other lawsuit against Carrington Mortgage Services, Inc . This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5072

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Waters, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Pamela Becker

Respondents and Defendants

Carrington Mortgage Services LLC et al.

Carrington Mortgage Services, Inc., et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Michael D. Kwasigroch

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael D. Kwasigroch

1975 Royal Avenue, Suite 4

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Kristina Marie Pelletier

Attorney at Wright, Finlay, & Zak, LLP

4665 Macarthur Court, Suite 280

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondents to recover costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: Raye, P.J, Robie, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: CCIS and Mediation Statement due: 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's. Receipt #R325157.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and appellant's civil appeal mediation statement due: 11/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 10/18/2021. Declaratory relief, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: STKCVURP201916909; Trial Court Judge: Waters, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carrington Mortgage Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pelletier, Kristina Marie