This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/07/2022 at 07:36:36 (UTC).

BeachCITI Construction, Inc. v. Rich Estate Properties, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 BeachCITI Construction, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Rich Estate Properties, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2355

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

BeachCITI Construction, Inc.

Mory Berengian

Appellants and Defendants

Rich Estate Properties, Inc.

Richard Khatibi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Karla Josephine Kraft

Attorney at Stradling Yocca Carlson & Rauth, P.C.,

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michael D. Kwasigroch

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Kwasigroch

1975 Royal Ave #4

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Rich Estate Properties, Inc. Attorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch Defendant and Appellant: Richard Khatibi Attorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Rich Estate Properties, Inc.Attorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch Defendant and Appellant: Richard KhatibiAttorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (March 26, 2021: Rich Estate Properties, Inc., et al. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card; Rich Estate Properties, Inc., Defendant and Appellant Michael D. Kwasigroch, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: March 26, 2021: Rich Estate Properties, Inc., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC707608; Trial Court Judge: Fujie, Holly

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICH ESTATE PROPERTIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwasigroch, Michael D.