This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/17/2022 at 20:13:18 (UTC).

Bayside Covenant Church, Inc., v. The Superior Court of Sacramento County

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Bayside Covenant Church, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Sacramento County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Krueger, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5727

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Krueger, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bayside Covenant Church, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Sacramento County

Interested Parties

Ashton Fritz et al.

Hume Lake Christian Camps, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Amanda Fay Benedict

Attorney at Sims, Lawrence & Broghammer

2261 Lava Ridge Court

Roseville, CA 95661

John D. Broghammer

Attorney at Sims, Lawrence & Broghammer

2261 Lava Ridge Court

Roseville, CA 95661

Cynthia Gill Lawrence

Attorney at Sims, Lawrence & Broghammer

2261 Lava Ridge Court

Roseville, CA 95661

Interested Party Attorneys

Julie M. Chopourian

Attorney at JMC Law Solutions

180 Promenade Circle, Suite #300

Sacramento, CA 95834

Kimberly Suzanne Oberrecht

Attorney at Horton, Oberrecht, Kirkpatrick & Martha

101 W. Broadway, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101-8296

Dawn Christina Nelms

Attorney at Horton, Oberrecht, Kirkpatrick & Martha

101 W. Broadway, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101-8296

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: Requests due: 09/13/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Return by petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ with service filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service; Notes: By petitioner for alternative writ of mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Written return filed.; Notes: RPIs Ashton Fritzm, Kevin Fritz, and Sarah Fritz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioner's counsel enclosing alternative writ and directing to serve in same manner as summons and return original to this court with proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued alternative writ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order granting alternative writ.; Notes: Let an alternative writ of mandate issue. Written return to the alternative writ by real parties in interest is to be served and filed by April 14, 2022. Petitioner's reply, if any, is to be served and filed with this court 15 days after the filing of the written return. DUARTE, J.; RENNER, J. I dissent. I would deny the petition. HULL, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for writ of mandate or prohibition. 5 vols. (967 pp.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or prohibition. With CIEP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34201900261594; Trial Court Judge: Krueger, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Sacramento County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOPOURIAN, JULIE M