This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/10/2022 at 06:07:00 (UTC).

BAYLISS (MARLON) ON H.C.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 BAYLISS MARLON ON H C was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4498

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Marlon Bayliss

Respondent

California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sheila O'Connor

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 232726

Encinitas, CA 92023

Respondent Attorney

Elizabeth M. Kuchar

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 10, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Marlon Bayliss Attorney: Sheila O'Connor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Marlon Bayliss Attorney: Sheila O'Connor **Considered with E075770**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E076814; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: FSB17394

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth M. Kuchar