This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/05/2021 at 02:36:52 (UTC).

Baykhurazov v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Baykhurazov filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Folan, Maureen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8893

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Folan, Maureen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jakhongir Baykhurazov

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Interested Parties

FriendFinder Networks, Inc.

DOES 1 through 30, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Frank Joseph Zeccola

Attorney at GOMEZ LAW GROUP

2725 Jefferson Street Suite 7

Carlsbad, CA 92008-5812

Boris Smyslov

Attorney at GOMEZ LAW GROUP

2725 Jefferson Street Suite 7

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Alvin Mark Gomez

Attorney at GOMEZ LAW GROUP

2725 Jefferson St Ste 7

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Interested Party Attorneys

Christopher Joseph Sargent

Attorney at Computerlaw Group LLP

401 Florence St

Palo Alto, CA 94301-1706

Jack Russo

Attorney at Computerlaw Group LLP

401 Florence Street

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opposition filed by 3/8/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate ***IMMEDIATE STAY REQUESTED*** Trial not scheduled Post Arbitration Status Conference: April 28, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV367170; Trial Court Judge: Folan, Maureen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FriendFinder Networks Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZECCOLA FRANK JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gomez, Alvin M