This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/04/2023 at 05:01:57 (UTC).

Bat World Sanctuary v. Cummins

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Bat World Sanctuary filed an Other lawsuit against Cummins. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Escalante, Kristin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7355

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Escalante, Kristin

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Bat World Sanctuary

Konstantin Khionidi

Amanda Lollar

Defendant and Appellant

Mary Cummins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Philip H. Stillman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/21/2023

HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: By this form, a copy of which has been mailed to all parties, the corporation or other artificial or separate, legal entity identified below is given notice that it must secure legal representation to participate is this appeal. Bat World Sanctuary is hereby notified that it is without counsel in the above captioned matter, and that if it wishes to participate in this appeal, it must serve and file a notice of representation before attempting to file any document in this court. (Merco Construction Engineers v. Municipal Court (1978) 21 Cal.3d 724; Paradise v. Nowlin (1948) 86 Cal.App.2d 897; Bus. & Prof. C. 6125.) If the above entity is an appellant and fails to serve and file notice of representation within 15 days of the date of this notice, its appeal will be dismissed as moot.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated March 21, 2023: 8.122 w. Settled Statement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Mary Cummins Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Mary CumminsPro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: order granting fees dated 2/6/2023 SCLA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: notice of appeal filed 2/21/2023 - Mary Cummins

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BS140207; Trial Court Judge: Escalante, Kristin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less