This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 01:29:53 (UTC).

Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP v. Garau et al.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder Weiss, LLP filed an Other lawsuit against Garau. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hill, Deirdre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5960

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hill, Deirdre

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP

Appellants and Defendants

Carlos Garau

Olga Garau

Torrance, CA 90510

Torrance Unified School District

Investment Retrievers, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Rule 8.29

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

John A. Perry

Attorney at Law Offices Of Robert E. Weiss Incorporated

920 S. Village Oaks Drive

Covina, CA 91724

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Olga H. Garau

Attorney at Law Office of Olga Garau

P.O. Box 3127

Torrance, CA 90510

Brian Inman Hamblet

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen LLP

444 S Flower St Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Consumer Law Section

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street

Sacramento, CA 95814-2919

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 01/12/2023 By 15 Day(s) NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 01/27/2023 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 12/28/2022 By 30 Day(s) NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 12/28/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants' motion to compel filing of augmented and corrected reporters' transcript on appeal and request for order to show cause re sanctions, filed September 30, 2022; and appellants' letter dated October 19, 2022, have been read and considered. Appellants' motion to compel is denied. The request for order to show cause re sanctions is denied. Appellants' appendix and opening brief remain due on or before November 28, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Letter from appellant's counsel dated October 19, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: Corrected reporters transcript (dated Aug. 19, 2021; Sept. 24, 2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 11/28/2022 By 61 Day(s) NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: to compel filing of augmented and corrected reporters' transcript on appeal; request for order to show cause re sanctions for failure to comply with 6/13/2022 order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: motion to augment and correct reporter's transcript on appeal filed by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1*** STRICKEN per 6-13-22 Order ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee Waiver granted to Olga Garau on Nov 5, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Carlos Garau Attorney: Olga H. Garau Defendant and Appellant: Olga Garau Attorney: Olga H. Garau (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant Olga Garau

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 01/12/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Carlos GarauAttorney: Olga H. Garau Defendant and Appellant: Olga Garau; Notes: NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Carlos GarauAttorney: Olga H. Garau Defendant and Appellant: Olga GarauAttorney: Olga H. Garau; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Oct. 18, 2021: Carlos Garau, et al. - (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: YC072760; Trial Court Judge: Hill, Deirdre

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where TORRANCE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERRY JOHN ANDREW