This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/17/2022 at 20:06:34 (UTC).

BARONE v. FERADAY

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 BARONE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against FERADAY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0456

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Christopher T. Barone

Respondent and Defendant

Caroline Feraday

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Alejandro H. Herrera

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Christopher T. Barone Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Christopher T. Barone Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. p; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311303; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19VECV01634

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less