Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/03/2021 at 16:22:38 (UTC).

Bard v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Bard filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Long, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8614

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Long, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yvonne Bard

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Davinci Builders Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark J. Leonardo

Attorney at Kuzyk Law, LLP

1700 West Avenue K Suite 101

Lancaster, CA 93534

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Thomas Long

Attorney at Dept. 31

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Gagik Stepanyan

Attorney at Hosp Gilbert & Bergsten

100 N First St Ste 300

Burbank, CA 91502-1845

Robert Troy Bergsten

Attorney at Hosp, Gilbert & Bergsten

301 North Lake Avenue, Suite 410

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed November 3, 2020, as well as the preliminary opposition. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 responsive feePaid via cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: RPI Davinci Builders Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: exhibits in support of preliminary opposition filed by RPI Davinci Builders Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: preliminary opposition to writ petition filed by RPI Davinci Builders Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: amended proof of service filed by petitioner's counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Petitioner re: Please submit supplemental proof of service identifying attorney information for real party in interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 2 of 2 (Labeled Appendix)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Mandate - Vol 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVINCI BUILDERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPANYAN GAGIK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGSTEN ROBERT T.