This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/05/2022 at 01:06:07 (UTC).

Ball Up, LLC v. Singer

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Ball Up, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Singer. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1928

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Ball Up, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Michael Singer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Joshua David Burk

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 W 6Th St Ste 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014-1208

Robert Nathan Klieger

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan LLP

523 West Sixth Street Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Alexander M. Botoman

275 E Green St Apt 1366

Pasadena, CA 91101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Reuben A. Ginsburg

Attorney at MICHELMAN & ROBINSON, LLP

10880 Wilshire Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Mona Z. Hanna

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson LLP.

17901 Von Karman Ave Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Robert David Estrin

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson

10880 Wilshire Blvd. 19Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Samantha Alice Gavin

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave 10Fl

Irvine, CA 92614

Sanford Louis Michelman

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, 19Th

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Jesse James Contreras

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

10880 Wilshire Blvd Fl 19

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (dated Feb. 3, 2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 02/18/2022 By 60 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Michael Singer Attorney: Mona Z. Hanna Attorney: Reuben A. Ginsburg One extension granted for a total of 61 days: 09/17/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 11/29/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 02/18/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ball Up, LLCAttorney: Alexander M. Botoman Attorney: Joshua David Burk Attorney: Robert Nathan Klieger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Michael SingerAttorney: Mona Z. Hanna Attorney: Reuben A. Ginsburg; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 61 days: 09/17/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 11/29/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Reporter's Transcript lodged by Appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 1 of 1. Total pages 454.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ball Up, LLC Attorney: Alexander M. Botoman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ball Up, LLCAttorney: Alexander M. Botoman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to court's June 8, 2021 notice - conformed copy of the signed order or judgment of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The civil case information statement for the above-entitled appeal was received and filed on May 12, 2021. However, it is insufficient, as you did not attach a written, signed order or judgment of dismissal. (Code Civ. Proc., 581d.) Ordinarily, no appeal lies from an order sustaining a demurrer without leave to amend; it lies instead in the signed order or judgment of dismissal entered after the order sustaining the demurrer. (Code Civ. Proc., 901.4; Hill v. City of Long Beach (1995) 33 Cal.App.4th 1684, 1695; Mounger v. Gates (1987) 193 Cal.App.3d 1248, 1254.) Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this notice, provide the court with a conformed copy of the signed order or judgment of dismissal and proof of service showing that opposing parties have been served with a copy of the order or judgment. Failure to do so may result in the appeal being dismissed as taken from a nonappealable order. (Sherman v. Standard Mines (1913) 166 Cal. 524, 525.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ball Up, LLC Attorney: Robert Nathan Klieger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ball Up, LLCAttorney: Robert Nathan Klieger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated April 21, 2021: 8.124 w. RT to be lodged w. DCA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check #1686 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Apr 2, 2021 by Ball Up, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV30463; Trial Court Judge: Fujie, Holly

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BALL UP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reuben A. Ginsburg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Alice Gavin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONTRERAS JESSE J