This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/06/2023 at 02:29:32 (UTC).

Balboa Capital Corporation v. Chambers-Kersey et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Balboa Capital Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Chambers-Kersey. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Howard, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1599

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Howard, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Balboa Capital Corporation

Appellants and Defendants

Zerline Chambers-Kersey

Zerline Chambers-Kersey, M.D. P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Timothy Michael Kowal

Michelle M Chiongson

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

James G Benedetto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Oral argument deemed waived.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Zerline Chambers-Kersey Attorney: James G Benedetto Defendant and Appellant: Zerline Chambers-Kersey, M.D. P.C. Attorney: James G Benedetto CIP not bookmarked.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument deemed waived.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: *** Motion/Request Deferred ***; Notes: Respondent's request for judicial notice will be decided in conjunction with the decision on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Zerline Chambers-KerseyAttorney: James G Benedetto Defendant and Appellant: Zerline Chambers-Kersey, M.D. P.C.Attorney: James G Benedetto; Notes: CIP not bookmarked.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: by respondent to augment the record on appeal. Exhibits in support of request to augment. (received only)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Exhibits in support of respondent's request for judicial notice. (received only)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: by Respondent Balboa Capital Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument letter sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Due to an incorrect email address provided for appellants' counsel, case number G061599 was dismissed on August 24, 2022. On the court's own motion and for good cause, the appeal is reinstated. Appellants are directed to submit a civil case information statement within 10 days from the date of this order. The Superior Court is directed to proceed with the preparation of the record on appeal pursuant to the California Rules of Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: Appellants failed to file a Civil Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8. 100(g), after notice that appellants were in default. Accordingly, the appeal is DISMISSED. Appellants are advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 3 0-day jurisdictional deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Filed by respondent. Associates Attorney Timothy M. Kowal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed (07/25/2022) Proceeding under rule 8.122 without RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By appellants Zerline Chambers-Kersey and Zerline Chambers-Kersey, M.D. P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01086458; Trial Court Judge: Howard, Theodore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less