This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/09/2023 at 10:01:08 (UTC).

Baghdassarians v. SK Vision, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Baghdassarians filed an Other lawsuit against SK Vision, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kin, Curtis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0345

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kin, Curtis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Areg Baghdassarians

Defendant and Respondent

SK Vision, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Vahe Khojayan

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Robert I. Alkana

Eugene S. Alkana

 

Court Documents

B310345

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Rubin, Laurence D.; Participants: Kim, Dorothy C. (Concur) Moor, Carl H. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished)The judgment is affirmed. The matter is remanded for the trial court to enter an amended judgment, providing that, on SK Vision's cross-complaint's cause of action for declaratory relief, the court finds that SK Vision's property, known as parcel number 5810-019-007, is not subject to any easement by necessity in favor of Baghdassarians' property, parcel number 5810-019-007. Baghdassarians shall pay SK Vision's costs on appeal. Rubin-Moor-Kim / 18 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Dear Counsel: There is some ambiguity in the briefs and the record as to which parcel is the vacant land and which parcel contains the residence. The two lots have assessor's parcel numbers 5810-019-007 and 5810-019-009. According to the agreed statement provided on appeal, the 007 parcel contains the vacant lot and the 009 parcel is the residential property. (1 CT 27) The trial court's judgment similarly identifies the 009 parcel as the property owned by SK Vision (i.e., the residence) and the 007 parcel as the one owned by Baghdassarians (the vacant lot). (1 CT 9-10) The briefs take the opposite view. Baghdassarians's opening brief represents that the residence is the 007 parcel and the vacant lot is the 009 parcel - the reverse of the agreed statement. (AOB 5) SK Vision's brief agrees with Baghdassarians's characterization. (RB 10-11) The briefs appear to be correct. (See, e.g., 1 CT 167 [assessor's map], 2 CT 591 [trust deed from Baghdassarians in favor of SK Vision].) The parties should be prepared to address at oral argument whether the agreed statement and the trial court's judgment incorrectly identify the respective parcels. The parties should also be prepared to address whether the judgment should be modified to properly reflect the assessor's parcel numbers (and, if necessary, the legal descriptions) of the two properties. No further briefing is requested at this time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Areg Baghdassarians Attorney: Vahe Khojayan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Corrected proof of service of respondent's letter brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: re respondent's letter brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: SK Vision, LLC Attorney: Eugene S. Alkana Attorney: Robert I. Alkana [NOT TO EXCEED 7 PAGES]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Areg Baghdassarians Attorney: Vahe Khojayan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Areg BaghdassariansAttorney: Vahe Khojayan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks & Settled Statement (592 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Areg Baghdassarians Attorney: Vahe Khojayan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Areg BaghdassariansAttorney: Vahe Khojayan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by KG Law.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 1/15/2021 by Areg Baghdassarians

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19GDCV01096; Trial Court Judge: Kin, Curtis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less