This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/20/2021 at 03:07:59 (UTC).

BACALL v. SHUMWAY

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 BACALL filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SHUMWAY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8407

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Michael Bacall

RBC Entertainment, Inc.

Appellants and Defendants

Jeffrey Shumway

Timaeus Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan J. Freedman

Attorney at Freedman & Taitelman, LLP

1801 Century Park West, 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sean Michael Hardy

Attorney at Freedman & Taitelman, LLP

1801 Century Park West, Fifth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

James E. Fitzgerald

Attorney at Attorney at Law

16350 Ventura Boulevard, Suite D-802

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including July 23, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Jeffrey Shumway Attorney: James E. Fitzgerald Defendant and Appellant: Timaeus Group, LLC Attorney: James E. Fitzgerald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Michael Bacall Attorney: Bryan J. Freedman Plaintiff and Respondent: RBC Entertainment, Inc. Attorney: Bryan J. Freedman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Jeffrey Shumway Attorney: James E. Fitzgerald Defendant and Appellant: Timaeus Group, LLC Attorney: James E. Fitzgerald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Jeffrey Shumway Attorney: James E. Fitzgerald Defendant and Appellant: Timaeus Group, LLC Attorney: James E. Fitzgerald

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302787; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC674035

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZGERALD JAMES EUGENE