This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/24/2023 at 02:15:57 (UTC).

Azizi et al. v. Rafalian

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Azizi filed an Other lawsuit against Rafalian. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Long, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4627

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Long, Thomas

 

Party Details

Defendant, Appellant and Not Yet Classified

Behnam Rafalian

Not Yet Classified and Respondents

David Azizi

Michael L. Magasinn

Shahram Elyaszadeh

Yona Samih

Shahram Ravaie

Behnam Rafalian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Kenneth B. Bley

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson

2029 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3284

Not Yet Classified and Respondent Attorneys

Daniel R. Sallus

Attorney at Stone & Sallus, LLP.

1500 Rosecrans Ave. Ste 500

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Jacob N. Segura

Attorney at Jacob N. Segura, A Law Corporation

11400 West Olympic Blvd. Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd. 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd 4Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David W. Affeld

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes & Zucker LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Ray England

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park E Ste 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3126

David A. Sergenian

Attorney at Sergenian Law PC

2355 Westwood Blvd. Suite 529

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Joseph Miskabi

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph Miskabi

9454 Wilshire Blvd Ste 600

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2980

Not Yet Classified, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

Daniel R. Sallus

Attorney at Stone & Sallus, LLP.

1500 Rosecrans Ave. Ste 500

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Jacob N. Segura

Attorney at Jacob N. Segura, A Law Corporation

11400 West Olympic Blvd. Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Kenneth B. Bley

Attorney at Cox, Castle & Nicholson

2029 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3284

Kevin John Leichter

Attorney at The Leichter Firm, APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd. 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Ethan Hewitt

Attorney at The Leichter Firm APC

10203 Santa Monica Blvd 4Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David W. Affeld

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes & Zucker LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Ray England

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park E Ste 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3126

David A. Sergenian

Attorney at Sergenian Law PC

2355 Westwood Blvd. Suite 529

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Joseph Miskabi

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph Miskabi

9454 Wilshire Blvd Ste 600

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2980

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 7, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 23, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Behnam Rafalian Attorney: Kenneth B. Bley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Behnam RafalianAttorney: Kenneth B. Bley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #5030479 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on November 14, 2022 by Behnam Rafalian.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV06801; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: TC029184; Trial Court Judge: Long, Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less