This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2022 at 00:57:10 (UTC).

Ayala v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 Ayala filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tsao, Lee and Ito, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6658

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Tsao, Lee

Ito, Roger

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Leonardo Ayala

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Ricardo Daniel Garcia

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender

320 West Temple Street Ste 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Lorenmarie Manning

Attorney at La County Public Defender

320 W Temple St 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Mark G. Harvis

Attorney at Public Defender's Office

320 West Temple Street Suite 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Albert J. Menaster

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender's Office

210 West Temple St

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3266

Respondent Attorneys

Hon. Roger Ito

Attorney at Dept. N

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Christina Sonu Weiss

Attorney at LA County District Atty

210 W Temple St

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: On January 13, 2022, petitioner informed this court that the case against him was dismissed. Accordingly, the petition for writ of mandate filed December 1, 2021, is dismissed as moot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Counsel for Petitioner respectfully requests this court dismiss the writ petition as moot.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Letter submitted by Deputy District Attorney stating no return will be filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed December 1, 2021. GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREFOR, you are ordered to show cause before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90013, on April 6, 2022, why the relief prayed for in the petition for writ of mandate should not be granted. The return to the order to show cause shall be filed on or before January 14, 2022. A reply, if any, shall be filed on or before February 11, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Criminal Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant