This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/17/2022 at 00:06:53 (UTC).

Ayala et al. v. Kanodia et al.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Ayala filed an Other lawsuit against Kanodia. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karlan, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0262

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karlan, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Alberto Ayala

Laura D. Roque Ayala

Defendant and Respondent

Tyler Development Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark E. Millard

Attorney at BANAFSHEH, DANESH & JAVID, PC

9701 Wilshire Blvd., 12 Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Olivier Alain Taillieu

Attorney at BD&J, PC

9701 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Fl

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Jennifer Renee Bagosy

Attorney at BD&J

9701 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Gilda Gazor

Attorney at BD&J

9701 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Tracy Diana Forbath

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-8198

Philip Nicholas Blanco

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2074

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C. Street 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Cary Linn Wood

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael S. Eisenbaum

Attorney at Gray, York & Duffy

15760 Ventura Blvd. 16Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

B310262

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Tyler is awarded costs on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final 13p./AFF/ACH; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Ashmann-Gerst, Judith Meisels; Participants: Hoffstadt, Brian M. (Concur) Chavez, Victoria M. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) 13p./AFF/ACHThe judgment is affirmed. Tyler is awarded costs on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: request for copy of oral argument audio filed by Leduar Acero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: 9:28:11-10:02:14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Tracy D. Forbath, counsel for respondent re: appearing for in-person oral argument in lieu of Jeffry A. Miller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: in-person oral argument protocol agreement form filed by respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: in-person oral argument protocol agreement form filed by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel appearing for oral argument re: in-person oral argument protocols and agreement form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Jeffry A. Miller, counsel for respondent- argue, 15 minutes;

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-4 (1168 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellants' notice of change of handling attorney. The handling attorneys this matter are Olivier A Taillieu and Jennifer R Bagosy of BD & J, PC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Defendant and Respondent, Tyler Development Company, hereby associates Jeffry A. Miller and Tracy D. Forbath of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP as associate counsel on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto Ayala Attorney: Mark E. Millard Plaintiff and Appellant: Laura D. Roque Ayala Attorney: Mark E. Millard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alberto AyalaAttorney: Mark E. Millard Plaintiff and Appellant: Laura D. Roque AyalaAttorney: Mark E. Millard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 1/22/2021 designating CT and RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 1/12/2021 by Alberto Ayala and Laura D. Roque Ayala

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC697015; Trial Court Judge: Karlan, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGOSY JENNIFER RENEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLARD, MARK E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAILLIEU OLIVIER A. ESQ.