This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/22/2021 at 06:03:16 (UTC).

Avco Corporation v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Avco Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Moss, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9546

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Moss, Robert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Avco Corporation

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon. Robert J. Moss, Dept. C14 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Anthony Longobardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Don Willenburg

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

1111 Broadway Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Manuel Saldana

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

633 W 5Th St 52Nd Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Interested Party Attorneys

Zareh Agob Jaltorossian

Attorney at Dakessian Law, Ltd

445 S Figueroa St, Ste 2210

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Aghavni Vartan Kasparian

Attorney at KP Law

150 E Colorado Blvd Ste 206

Pasadena, CA 91105-3722

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record shipped to records center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Ext. by Supreme Court re: petition for hearing filed:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 29, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Filed by petitioner AVCO CorporationSupreme Court case number S265347

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: Supreme Court case number S265347, Petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stay are DENIED. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Ikola, J., and Thompson, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Amended proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petitioner's writ of mandate 4 volumes of exhibits (1-1678 pgs) Temporary Immediate Stay Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By petitioner Avco Corporation (50 pgs)TEMPORARY IMMEDIATE STAY REQUESTED March 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALDANA MANUEL