This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/25/2021 at 01:31:51 (UTC).

AVCO CORPORATION v. S.C. (LONGOBARDO)

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 AVCO CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against C LONGOBARDO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5347

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Supreme Court

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Avco Corporation

Respondent

Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. Robert J. Moss, Department C14 700 Civic Center Drive West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Party

Anthony Longobardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Don Willenburg

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

M. Christopher Hall

Attorney at Sedgwick, LLP

633 West Fifth Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Manuel Saldana

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Interested Party Attorneys

Zareh Agob Jaltorossian

Attorney at Dakessian Law, Ltd

445 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2210

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Aghavni Vartan Kasparian

Attorney at KP Law

150 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 206

Pasadena, CA 91105-3722

Zareh A. Jaltorossian

Attorney at KP Law

150 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 206

Pasadena, CA 91105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including January 29, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Avco Corporation Attorney: Don Willenburg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Anthony Longobardo Attorney: Zareh A. Jaltorossian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Avco Corporation Attorney: Don Willenburg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G059546; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Orange County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-00970710

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zareh Agob Jaltorossian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPARIAN AGHAVNI V.