Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/19/2021 at 13:08:13 (UTC).

Austin Gillespie et al. v. The Superior Court; State of California Dept. of Transportation et al.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Austin Gillespie filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court State of California Dept of Transportation. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riemer, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5977

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Fourth Appellate District - Division 2

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riemer, Craig

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Austin Gillespie (+8)

James Chaffee

Jarrell Boyd

Dion Barrera

Silvino De Anda, Jr.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Parties

HNTB Corporation

Parsons Corporation

AECOM

URS Corporation

Acutant Corporation

Zurich American Insurance Company

Southstar Engineering and Consulting, Inc.

Riverside County Transportation Commission

Danny Mara

Sequoia Consultants, In.

State of California Department of Transportation

Parsons Transportation Group

Simkins Company, Inc. dba Jack-X-Change

Clark Construction Group, LLC (+)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Stuart B. Esner

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Allan F. Davis

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie, Inc.

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Patrick Brian Embrey

Attorney at Robinson Calcagnie, Inc.

19 Corporate Plaza Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Christopher R. Aitken

Attorney at Aitken Aitken Cohn

3 Macarthur Place, Suite 800

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Megan J. Demshki

Attorney at Aitken Aitken Cohn

3 Macarthur Place, Suite 800

Santa Ana, CA 92707

John A. Girardi

Attorney at Girardi & Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

George Terterian

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Justin P. Ehrlich

Attorney at Herzog, Yuhas, Ehrlich & Ardell

11400 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Eric M. Freedman

Attorney at Herzog, Yuhas, Ehrlich & Ardell

11400 W. Olympic Blvd., Suite 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Interested Party Attorneys

Todd Adam Chamberlain

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming

801 S Grand Ave 9Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Raina Laurie Richter

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Richard Stone Linkert

Attorney at Matheny Sears Linkert & Jaime LLP

3638 American River Dr

Sacramento, CA 95864

Jeffrey E Levine

Attorney at Matheny, Sears, Linkert & Jaime, LLP

3638 American River Drive

Sacramento, CA 95864

Patrick Michael Quigley

Attorney at Morales, Fierro & Reeves

2151 Salvio Street, Suite 280

Concord, CA 94520

Jonathon David Sayre

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd., Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Christine Michelle La Vorgna

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez Trester LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612-2438

Daniel P Fallon

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Robert Francis Tyson

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

Kenneth Coy Ward

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94111-3715

John Lauchlan Kortum

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94111-3715

10 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: McKinster - Menetrez - Fields

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: RPI Caltrans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: in support of opposition to petition for writ of mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: to petition by RPI Caltrans

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Oppo & exhibits; submitted under appeal case number E075843

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Voice Mail message for:; Notes: Stuart Esner; if other attys on cover are not co-counsel, then please submit an Amended Petition without the other attorneys on the covers. Mr. Esner states they are co-counsel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: (2068 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HNTB CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNIA-DEPARTMENT OF PARKS is a litigant