This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/13/2021 at 13:49:58 (UTC).

Austin Gillespie et al. v. State of California Department of Transportation

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Austin Gillespie filed an Other lawsuit against State of California Department of Transportation. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Riemer, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5843

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Riemer, Craig

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Austin Gillespie (+13)

Defendants and Respondents

AECOM

Actuant Corporation

State of California Department of Transportation

Southstar Engineering and Consulting, Inc.

Sequoia Consultants, Inc.

Danny Mara

Riverside County Transportation Commission

Parsons Corporation

Clark Construction Group, LLC (+3)

Parsons Transportation Group, Inc.

Simkins Company, Inc.

HNTB Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Stuart B. Esner

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Boulevard, Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Marion Teresa Hack

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Raina Laurie Richter

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

350 S Grand Ave Ste 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3427

Jeffrey E Levine

Attorney at Matheny, Sears, Linkert & Jaime, LLP

3638 American River Drive

Sacramento, CA 95864

Richard Stone Linkert

Attorney at Matheny Sears Linkert & Jaime LLP

3638 American River Dr

Sacramento, CA 95864

Daniel P Fallon

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Robert Francis Tyson

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

David Justin Kahn

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

Jonathon David Sayre

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester, LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd., Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Lawrence David Esten

Attorney at Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612

Christine Michelle La Vorgna

Attorney at Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez Trester LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612-2438

Malcolm D. Schick

Attorney at Gray & Prouty

3170 Fourth Ave., Third Fl.

San Diego, CA 92103-5850

Maya C. Uffenheimer

Attorney at G&P|Schick

3170 4Th Ave Fl 4

San Diego, CA 92103

Douglas Wayne Robinson

Attorney at Palmieri Tyler Wiener Wilhelm & Waldron LLP

1900 Main St Ste 700

Irvine, CA 92614-7328

Todd Adam Chamberlain

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming

801 S Grand Ave 9Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Russell Scott Wollman

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue, Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kenneth Coy Ward

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94111-3715

John Lauchlan Kortum

Attorney at Severson & Werson

1 Embarcadero Ctr Fl 26

San Francisco, CA 94111-3715

Shain A. Wasser

Attorney at Severson & Werson

19100 Von Karman Ave Ste 700

Irvine, CA 92612-6578

Mary Childs

Attorney at Yoka & Smith LLP

445 S Figueroa St, Fl 38

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: An extension was granted pursuant to stipulation. Respondent is notified of no further extensions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/09/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: RB Stip for extension; Counsel included an additional party that is not listed in this court's file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 05/10/2021 By 32 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 8 vols (2315 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Austin Gillespie (+13) Attorney: Megan J. Demshki

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appendices to AOB (8 vols); missing inclusive page numbers for each volume. Rule 8.144 (b)(7)(A) AOB has not been rejected. Counsel has until 4:30 p.m. today to resubmit corrected appendices. If not received, the brief will also be rejected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/09/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: State of California Department of TransportationAttorney: Daniel P Fallon Attorney: David Justin Kahn Attorney: Robert Francis Tyson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Austin Gillespie (+13)Attorney: Megan J. Demshki

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Oct 19, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Respondents State of CA DOT & Riverside County Transportation Comm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Dtd Oct 8, 2020; By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Sep 29, 2020; Austin Gillespie et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1606486; Trial Court Judge: Riemer, Craig

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEQUOIA CONSULTANTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HNTB CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant