This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 04:25:04 (UTC).

Auld-Susott v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Auld-Susott filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9399

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rudy, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Evan Auld-Susott

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Interested Parties

Harold Erdman

John L. Susott

Daniel Susott

Honolulu, HI 96822

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jeffrey Lewis

Attorney at Jeff Lewis Law

609 Deep Valley Dr. Suite 200

Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Sean Christopher Rotstan

Attorney at Jeff Lewis Law

609 Deep Valley Dr Ste 200

Rllng Hills Est, CA 90274-3614

Interested Party Attorneys

Frank Ubhaus

Attorney at Berliner Cohen

Ten Almaden Blvd 11Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Thomas Anthony Vogele

Attorney at Thomas Vogele & Associates, APC

129 W. Wilson St. Suite 200

Costa Mesa, CA 92627

Timothy Michael Kowal

Attorney at Thomas Vogele & Associates, APC

129 W. Wilson St., Suite 200

Costa Mesa, CA 92627

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: Having received correspondence from counsel for petitioner advising this court that petitioner seeks to withdraw the petition for writ of mandate, the petition for writ of mandate is denied as moot. (MJG, PBM, AMD participated in this decision.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Petitioner withdrawing writ filed on 9/9/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Showing service of petition and exhibits on all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or other appropriate relief

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Santa Clara County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOGELE THOMAS A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ubhaus, Frank R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Michael Kowal