This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/06/2023 at 17:47:20 (UTC).

Attia et al. v. Google, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Attia filed an Other lawsuit against Google, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9869

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Eli Attia

Attia PC

Defendant and Appellant

Google, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Denise Marie DeMory

Myron Moskovitz

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Fred Anthony Rowley, Jr

David H. Kramer

Charles Tait Graves

Conor Denali Tucker

Joshua Alec Baskin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: June 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Google, Inc. Attorney: Fred Anthony Rowley, Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Google, Inc.Attorney: Fred Anthony Rowley, Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Eli Attia Attorney: Denise Marie DeMory Plaintiff and Respondent: Attia PC Attorney: Denise Marie DeMory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Your submitted filing (appellants' reply brief (no. H049586) and cross-respondents' brief (no. H049869)) has been rejected. Missing bookmarks. Please include an electronic bookmark to each heading, subheading, and the first page of any component of the document, and resubmit.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Myron Moskovitz for respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Eli AttiaAttorney: Denise Marie DeMory Plaintiff and Respondent: Attia PCAttorney: Denise Marie DeMory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Unredacted under seal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Redacted public version

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proposed briefing sequence filed by:; Notes: The Parties understand and agree that briefing in Appeal Nos. H049586 and H049586 will proceed in four briefs, including two consolidated briefs, in the manner and on the dates as follows: 1. Attia's Opening Brief in Appeal No. H049586, due July 15, 2022. 2. Google's consolidated Respondent's Brief in Appeal No. H049586 and Opening Brief and Rule 8.124 Appendix in Appeal No. H049869, due within 60 days after the filing of Attia's Opening Brief. 3. Attia's consolidated Reply Brief in Appeal No. H049586 and Respondent's Brief in Appeal No. H049869, due within 60 days after the filing of Google's consolidated Respondent's and Opening Brief. 4. Google's Reply Brief in Appeal No. H049869, due within 30 days after the filing of Attia's consolidated Reply and Respondent's Brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The parties' joint motion to consolidate is denied. On the court's own motion, appeals H049586 and H049869 shall be considered together for all purposes, including record preparation, briefing, oral argument and disposition. Briefs shall proceed pursuant to the stipulation of the parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joint motion to consolidate H049586 and H049869.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).; Notes: The appellant's appendix and opening brief are due 70 days from the filing of the designation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 3/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant, order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS rejected. Attorney information only listed for Google. Please complete party/attorney information for all parties to the case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Google, Inc. et al., Filed 3/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 20141CV274103; Trial Court Judge: Kirwan, Peter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less