This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/22/2022 at 01:52:37 (UTC).

Atiz Innovation Company Limited, A Foreign Company v. Warnock

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Atiz Innovation Company Limited, A Foreign Company filed an Other lawsuit against Warnock. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4203

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kim, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Atiz Innovation Company Limited, A Foreign Company

Appellant and Defendant

Nicholas Warnock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Sean Michael Foldenauer

Attorney at FOLDENAUER LAW GROUP, APLC

2550 5Th Ave Ste 630

San Diego, CA 92103

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jeff A. Mann

Attorney at Law Offices of Jeff Mann

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1428

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jeffrey Lewis

Attorney at Jeff Lewis Law

609 Deep Valley Drive Suite 200

Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Sean C. Rotstan

Attorney at Jeff Lewis Law

609 Deep Valley Drive Suite 200

Rolling Hills Estates, CA 90274

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 01/28/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 01/28/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 23, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nicholas Warnock Attorney: Jeff A. Mann Attorney: Jeffrey Lewis Attorney: Sean C. Rotstan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 01/28/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nicholas WarnockAttorney: Jeff A. Mann Attorney: Jeffrey Lewis Attorney: Sean C. Rotstan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Nicholas WarnockAttorney: Jeff A. Mann Attorney: Jeffrey Lewis Attorney: Sean C. Rotstan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Jeff A. Mann associates in Jeff Lewis and Jeff Lewis Law as co-counsel for appellant Nicholas Warnock.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's filing fee paid via credit card.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on July 13, 2021 by Nicholas Warnock

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19LBCV00104; Trial Court Judge: Kim, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Rotstan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS, JEFFREY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANN JEFF A.