This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/17/2021 at 11:32:13 (UTC).

Ascencio et al. v. FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Ascencio filed an Other lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Linfield, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1227

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Linfield, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Andres Ascencio

Luis Saul Ascencio

Respondent and Defendant

FCA US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Payam Shahian

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1840 Century Park East, Suite #430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Anh X. Nguyen

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1840 Century Park East Suite 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Arlyn L Escalante

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Rd Ste 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Hallen D. Rosner

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer C. Suarez

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 S. Grand Avenue Suite 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jennifer A. Kuenster

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1 Embarcadero Center Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kristi Jean Livedalen

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

300 S Grand Ave Ste 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3151

Leon Vram Roubinian

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Embarcadero Ctr 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3600

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Good cause appearing, the order of dismissal filed August 3, 2021, is vacated and the appeal filed March 11, 2021, is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure to comply as required by the rules of court. Appellant must pay the reporter's transcript fees pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.130(b) within 15 days from the date of this order. The reporter's transcript fees must be paid at the Los Angeles Superior Court at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111-A, Los Angeles, California. Appellant shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall appellant take more than 15 days to do so. If appellant fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed March 11, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed July 23, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andres Ascencio Attorney: Arlyn L Escalante Plaintiff and Appellant: Luis Saul Ascencio Attorney: Arlyn L Escalante

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andres AscencioAttorney: Arlyn L Escalante Plaintiff and Appellant: Luis Saul AscencioAttorney: Arlyn L Escalante

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal and election to proceed by appendix (CRC 8.124) with RT, filed on 3/11/2021 by Andres Ascencio and Luis Saul Ascencio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV19663; Trial Court Judge: Linfield, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NGUYEN ANH X.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Payam Shahian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arlyn L Escalante