This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/06/2022 at 04:01:28 (UTC).

Arteaga et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Arteaga filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Iwasaki, Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9461

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Iwasaki, Bruce

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Valente Cruz Arteaga

Rebecca Sanchez

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Bruce Iwasaki

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center

Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP

Premier B.H., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Francis Moran

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

David E. Ramirez

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive Ste 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Dean Harold McVay

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois Bisgaard Smith

650 East Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: By way of minute order filed May 4, 2022, the respondent court has complied with the alternative writ of mandate issued April 21, 2022. Accordingly, the alternative writ is discharged and the petition for writ of mandate filed April 4, 2022, is dismissed as moot. No costs are awarded in this proceeding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Petitioners status update per the courts order dated May 20, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On April 21, 2022, this court issued an alternative writ of mandate and directed that any return to the petition be filed by May 19, 2022. No return has been filed. The parties are directed to file a response, within five days of the date of this order, providing a status update and stating whether the petition for writ of mandate is now moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Alternative writ or OSC issued.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed April 4, 2022. The court tentatively concludes as follows. Triable issues of fact were presented from which a jury could conclude by clear and convincing evidence that real parties in interest acted with "recklessness." Therefore, after hearing the parties' positions on the matter pursuant to Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233, 1250, footnote 10, you are ordered to either: (a) vacate your March 15, 2022, order granting the motion for summary adjudication as to the elder abuse and willful misconduct causes of action, as well as to the claims for punitive damages and attorney fees, and enter a new and different order denying the motion; or (b) show cause before this court in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90013, on July 5, 2022, why a peremptory writ ordering you to do so should not issue. The return to the petition shall be filed on or before May 19, 2022. Any reply to the return, if any, shall be filed on or before June 16, 2022. If you comply with this writ by selecting alternative (a) above, you are directed to provide this court with a copy of your minute order setting forth such compliance. Petitioners shall also provide this court with a copy of any such minute order upon receipt.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The immediate stay request is denied for failure to make an adequate showing of urgency.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 14 volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where PREMIER BH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCVAY DEAN HAROLD