This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/29/2021 at 00:03:30 (UTC).

Arrendando v. Fuentes et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Arrendando filed an Other lawsuit against Fuentes. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4314

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Ricardo Arrendando

Defendant and Appellant

Ruben Fuentes

Los Angeles, CA 90022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrei V. Serpik

Attorney at Anderson & Associates

140 S Lake Ave Ste 372

Pasadena, CA 91101

Michael Dale Anderson

Attorney at Anderson & Associates

The Commons 140 S. Lake Avenue, # 372

Pasadena, CA 91101-4789

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Aug. 6, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Granted on Aug 25, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ruben Fuentes Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Ruben FuentesPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 7/29/2021 by Ruben Fuentes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV24691

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERPIK ANDREI V.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON MICHAEL DALE