This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2022 at 01:47:07 (UTC).

Arredondo v. Ghasri et al.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Arredondo filed an Other lawsuit against Ghasri. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Draper, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2243

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Draper, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Ricardo Arredondo

Defendants and Respondents

Seaside Trustee Inc.

Community Loan Servicing, LLC fka Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC

10 Figure Holdings, LLC

Poya Ghasri

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Seaside Trustee, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Michael Dale Anderson

Attorney at Anderson & Associates

The Commons 140 S. Lake Avenue, # 372

Pasadena, CA 91101-4789

Andrei V. Serpik

Attorney at Anderson & Associates

140 S Lake Ave Ste 372

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Preston K. Ascherin

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 West 5Th Street Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joseph B. Yoon

Attorney at Akerman, LLP

601 W 5Th St Ste 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3506

Parisa Jassim

Attorney at Akerman LLP

601 W. Fifth St. Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gary Solomon Brotman

Attorney at Marquee Law Group, APC

9100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 445E

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-3412

Joseph Trenk

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph Trenk

7136 Haskell Avenue Suite 126

Van Nuys, CA 91406

Poya Ghasri

Attorney at Marquee Law Group, APC

9100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 445E

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-6 (1527 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 30, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ricardo Arredondo Attorney: Andrei V. Serpik

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: The CIS submitted via Truefiling for filing has been rejected. Judgment and/or appealable order was not provided as required by CRC, rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 02/01/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ricardo ArredondoAttorney: Andrei V. Serpik Attorney: Michael Dale Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ricardo ArredondoAttorney: Andrei V. Serpik

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Anderson & Associates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 3/22/2021 by Ricardo Arredondo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18STCV01146; Trial Court Judge: Draper, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 10 Figure Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEASIDE TRUSTEE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY LOAN SERVICING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERPIK ANDREI V.